Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wong, May, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Williams, Steven C, against Bagood, Leah Zuniga A.K.A Leah Zuniga A.K.A. Leah, Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time41 days |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons and complaint in a legal case filed by May Wong against Leah Zuniga, also known as Leah Marie Bagood. The case number is CUD-15-651332 and it was filed on February 4, 2015. The document indicates that t...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: 624 NAPLES STREET SAN FRANCISCO, CA 94112 CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCSICO, **APPLIES TO ALL UNNAMED/UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.** | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT/DEFAULT ENTERED, CLERK'S JUDGMENT REQUESTED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT **AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE**, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT OF POSSESSION, PROOF OF SERVICE ONLY, FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY SERVED JAN-29-2015, PRE-JUDGEMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT AS TO DEFENDANT DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 13, 2015 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT REJECTED, PLACED IN PICKUP BOX, SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE $55.00. FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY | |
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: LOST ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY (CCP 1169) FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | RECEIVED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT, CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WONG, MAY AS TO DEFENDANT BAGOOD, LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A LEAH ZUNIGA A.K.A. LEAH MARIE BAGOOD DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.