Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Happy Ocean Llc, Post Apple Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Keith, Brenda Cruz, against Does 1 To 10, Missionary Eagles Trust, Walker, Art, represented by Mellen, Matthew D, Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald Evans Quidachay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Evans Quidachay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time269 days |
OPPOSITION TO MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT WALKER, ART
Date: October 02, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, SATISFIED AS TO REAL PROPERTY ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT WALKER, ART MISSIONARY EAGLES TRUST | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER STAY OF EXECUTION FILED BY DEFENDANT WALKER, ART | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO DEFTS APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC POST APPLE LLC | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN OPPOS TO DEFTS REQUEST FOR A STAY FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC POST APPLE LLC | |
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF BRENDA CRUZ KEITH FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC POST APPLE LLC | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE DAILY RENTAL VALUE $198.33 FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC POST APPLE LLC | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT WALKER, ART MISSIONARY EAGLES TRUST | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER/NOTICE OF RULING FILED FILED BY PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC POST APPLE LLC | |
October 23, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PTLFS | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | UNLAWFUL DETAINER MOTION 501, PLAINTIFF HAPPY OCEAN LLC, AND POST APPLE LLC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. SEE DETAILS IN SCANNED ORDER AND JUDGMENT. (D501) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.