Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Archstone Communities, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Rothbard, Todd Bennett, against Does I Thru V, Incl. One St. Francis Place, #5404 San Francisco, Ca 94107, Mishra, Ashutosh One St. Francis Place, #5404 San Francisco, Ca 94107, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time56 days |
This complaint is a summons for an unlawful detainer-eviction case filed by Archstone Communities against Ashutosh Mishra and others. The complaint states that Ashutosh Mishra is being sued by Archstone Communities. The defendant is given five calend...
NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS
Date: February 28, 2008ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT
Date: March 07, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY, RETURNED AND FILED, FULLY SATISFIED AS TO DEFENDANT MISHRA, ASHUTOSH | |
March 28, 2008 | Docket Event | EXECUTION FOR POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY AS TO DEFENDANT MISHRA, ASHUTOSH | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCHSTONE COMMUNITIES SERVED MAR-11-2008, POSTING AND MAILING AS TO DEFENDANT MISHRA, ASHUTOSH | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | UNDER APPLICATION TO THE CLERK FOR JUDGMENT UNDER SEC 1169 C.C.P., IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ARCHSTONE COMMUNITIES RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT MISHRA, ASHUTOSH THE RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF THE PREMISES: ONE ST. FRANCIS PLACE, #5404, S.F. CA. 94107, SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT FILED/DEFAULT ENTERED, DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS AS TO DEFENDANT MISHRA, ASHUTOSH | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE DAILY RENTAL VALUE:$68.50 FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCHSTONE COMMUNITIES | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: LOST/UNAVAILABLE DOCUMENT - LEAE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCHSTONE COMMUNITIES | |
March 07, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT | |
March 06, 2008 | Docket Event | EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR POSTING AND MAILING OF SUMMONS, POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, DECLARATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARCHSTONE COMMUNITIES | |
February 28, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.