Case Last Refreshed: 5 hours ago
Kemper, Ruth Gay, Zolldan, Stacy, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Brown, Deborah, Dignity Health, Inc, Sierra Nevada Memorial Miners Hospital Inc, in the jurisdiction of Nevada County. This case was filed in Nevada County Superior Courts Superior Court of California.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2018 |
CategoryEmployment: Wrongful Term (36) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNevada County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior Court of California |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | RULING | |
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | POINTS & AUTHORITES IN SUPPORT OF | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING SET: | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK'S MINUTES | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.