Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case in the jurisdiction of Nevada County. This case was filed in Nevada County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2018 |
CategoryEmployment: Wrongful Term (36) |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationNevada County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is continued on the court's own motion to June 12, 2020, at 10:00 am in Dept. 6, to be heard with Plaintiff's Motions to Compel. The Court con...
Judge: Dept. 6 |
|
December 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer is granted. Procedurally, a motion for leave to file an amended pleading must include (1) a copy of the proposed and numbered amendment, (2) specifications by refere...
Judge: Dept. 6 |
|
August 10, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
On the court's motion, the hearing regarding Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment or, Alternatively, Summary Adjudication is continued to 16 August 2019, at 10:00 a.m. This is the Court's tentative...
Judge: Dept. 6 |
|
July 30, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Continue Trial and Related Dates is granted. The currently set Trial, PTC, and MSC dates are vacated. The proposed trial date is unavailable to the court. Therefore, a ...
Judge: Dept. 6 |
|
April 05, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant SNMH's Further Responses and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Horne's Further Responses are dropped as moot. Supplemental responses were served after the t...
Judge: Dept. 6 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.