Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lee,, Lee, Daishanique, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Lee,, Lee, Daishanique, Singh, Shadeep 410 23Rd Avenue - Apt. #2 San Francisco, Ca 94134, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with A. James Robertson II presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeA. James Robertson II Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2019 |
CategoryAuto Accident |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions127 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time212 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S REQUEST TO ENTER SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO DEFENDANT SINGH, SHADEEP | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S DECLARATION RECEIVED RE: REQUEST TO ENTER SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, DAISHANIQUE | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED AUG-01-2019 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS. THE REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS IS APPROVED, AND THE COURT ORDERS: PAYMENTS OF $100.00 ON THE 10TH OF EACH MONTH STARTING AUGUST 10, 2019 UNTIL THE FINAL PAYMENT DUE JANUARY 10, 2021. THE AMOUNT OF THE FINAL PAYMENT IS $66.00. PAYMENTS ARE DUE BY MAIL BY THE 10TH OF EACH MONTH. | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | (SC-221) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS FILED BY PLAINTIFF LEE, DAISHANIQUE AS TO DEFENDANT SINGH, SHADEEP | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FILED SC-220 REQUEST TO MAKE PAYMENTS. FILED BY DEFENDANT SINGH, SHADEEP AS TO PLAINTIFF LEE, DAISHANIQUE | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | REMARK: RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON APPEAL MAILED TO SHADEEP SINGH ON 5/30/19. PER U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, "RETURN TO SENDER - ATTEMPTED - NOT KNOWN - UNABLE TO FORWARD." | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (NO EXHIBITS RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO USE JUDGE PRO TEM AND ORDER FILED BY SINGH, SHADEEP LEE, DAISHANIQUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.