Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Irish, Daniel, filed a(n) Money case against Equifax, Inc., Irish, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Joseph M. Quinn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoseph M. Quinn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2017 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions476 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time553 days |
CASE_TRANSFERRED TO SUPERIOR COURT, RECORD AND EXHIBITS TRANSFERRED
Date: December 28, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: May 10, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: August 16, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: February 22, 2018REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT EQUIFAX, INC.
Date: December 13, 2017ORDER (SC-152) ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL: THE REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL IS APPROVED.
Date: December 14, 2017ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL GRANTED
Date: December 22, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: November 30, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED BY APPELLANT EQUIFAX, INC. MAILED TO RESPONDENT IRISH, DANIEL
Date: December 28, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT
Date: February 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS FROM EXHIBIT REPORT DATED MAY-01-2019 ORDERED DESTROYED | |
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ADDED TO EXHIBIT DESTRUCTION REPORT OF MAY-01-2019 | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT, FULLY SATISFIED, AS TO APPELLANT EQUIFAX, INC. | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | RECORD REMANDED TO SMALL CLAIMS (PLAINTIFF & DEFENDANT EXHIBITS, ORIGINALLY FORWARDED FROM SMALL CLAIMS TO THE APPEAL DIVISION RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS DIVISION) | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT RESPONDENT IRISH, DANIEL RECOVER FROM APPELLANT EQUIFAX, INC. $3,090.00 PRINCIPAL, $75.00 COSTS, $150.00 CCP 116.780(C), TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,315.00, SEE ORDER ATTACHED AND SIGNED THIS SAME DATE NO EXHIBITS FILED NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
February 22, 2019 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL CALENDAR OF FEB-14-2019 - JUDGMENT ENTERED. | |
February 14, 2019 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIM APPEALS
Judge: JOSEPH M. QUINN |
|
February 14, 2019 | Hearing |
SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL NOTICE OF TIME AND PLACE
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR FEB-14-2019 11:10 AM FOR DEPT 220 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.