Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Argrett, Jr, Ralph, filed a(n) Money case against Pereg, Albert H C O Project Open Hand San Francisco, Ca 94109, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Cecilia P. Castellanos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCecilia P. Castellanos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedSeptember 05, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions99 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time143 days |
ORDER RE: DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: February 07, 2018ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS)
Date: December 21, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ON (SC-105A) REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER (SMALL CLAIMS). THE REQUEST IS: GRANTED. DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE ENTERED ON FEB 7, 2018 IS SET ASIDE. | |
March 20, 2018 | Docket Event | REMARK: RETURNED MAIL: SC-105 REQUEST AND ANSWER MAILED TO DEFENDANT ON 02/21/18. A POST-IT NOTE ON THE FORM STATES "SORRY, THERE IS NO ONE BY THE NAME OF ALBERT PEREG AT THIS ADDRESS." ITEM WAS MAILED BACK TO THE COURT IN AN PROJECT OPEN HAND ENVELOPE. | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | SC-105 REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER & ANSWER RE: MISSED COURT DATE FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARGRETT, JR, RALPH | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: DISMISSED W/O PREJUDICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF AND NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. NO PROOF OF SERVICE. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE: CECILIA P. CASTELLANOS; CLERK: G. FELICIANO; NOT REPORTED. 506 | |
February 07, 2018 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: VISITING JUDGE |
|
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE (SEE SCANNED DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) | |
December 21, 2017 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF DEC-21-2017 - CONTINUED FOR PROOF OF SERVICE TO FEB-07-2018 AT 3:30 PM IN DEPT. 506. PLAINTIFF RAPLHY ARGRETT, JR. IS PRESENT. NO APPEARANCE BY THE DEFENDANT. NO EXHIBITS RETAINED. JUDGE PRO TEM: DAVID LAVINE; CLERK: J. MURPHY; NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
December 21, 2017 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN ATTEMPTING SERVICE FEE FOR SERVICE $ 0.00 - FILED BY PLAINTIFF ARGRETT, JR, RALPH AS TO DEFENDANT PEREG, ALBERT H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.