Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Acosta, Eduardo Jesus, filed a(n) Money case against Colima Auto Repair, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2011 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions43 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time43 days |
ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING GRANTED - JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID MCDONALD.
Date: December 28, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. DEFENDANT'S CHALLENGE TO VENUE IS GRANTED. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANT. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
January 25, 2012 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF CORPORATION PURSUANT TO CCP 116.540 (B)-(H) FILED BY DEFENDANT COLIMA AUTO REPAIR | |
January 13, 2012 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE THE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING GRANTED - JUDGE PRO TEM DAVID MCDONALD. | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS HEARING OF JAN-13-2012 - CONTINUED PER REQUEST OF DEFENDANT TO JAN-25-2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT. 506 | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF SERVED DEC-17-2011, PERSONAL SERVICE AS TO DEFENDANT COLIMA AUTO REPAIR | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO POSTPONE SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY DEFENDANT COLIMA AUTO REPAIR | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $4,500.00 FILED BY ACOSTA, EDUARDO JESUS AS TO DEFENDANT COLIMA AUTO REPAIR ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR JAN-13-2012 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPT 506 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.