Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Thompson, Kurt, filed a(n) Money case against Callet, Jerome, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Donald S. Mitchell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald S. Mitchell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time71 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF. APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF ONLY. JUDGE: DONALD S. MITCHELL. CLERK: S. VANTREE. NOT REPORTED. (506) | |
February 16, 2012 | Hearing |
PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM
Judge: DONALD S. MITCHELL |
|
February 06, 2012 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFENDANT JEROME CALLET RE: SERVICE. | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (SERVICE FEE $0.) SERVED DEC-17-2011, SUBSTITUTE SERVICE ON NATURAL PERSON AS TO DEFENDANT CALLET, JEROME D.B.A. CALLET TRUMPETS | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | MONEY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FOR $6,200.00 FILED BY THOMPSON, KURT AS TO DEFENDANT CALLET, JEROME D.B.A. CALLET TRUMPETS ORDER SETTING TRIAL ISSUED FOR FEB-16-2012 AT 03:30 PM IN DEPT 506 | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS PURSUANT TO G.C. 68633, CRC 3.51, 8.26, AND 8.818 (CONFIDENTIAL) FILED BY PLAINTIFF THOMPSON, KURT ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO G.C. 68634 (E), CRC 3.52 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.