Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Robinson, Jasmine C O Julia Perelman C O, filed a(n) Money case against Winter, Joshua, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2005 |
CategoryMoney |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions156 days |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time230 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2005 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS ORDERED DESTROYED | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | REFUND/DISBURSEMENT OF | |
September 29, 2005 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT CREDITOR'S REQUEST FOR FUNDS. | |
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR | |
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR OF DEPOSIT OF | |
August 22, 2005 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS RETURNED TO DEFENDANT. | |
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT | |
July 20, 2005 | Docket Event | THE COURT HAS ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PLAINTIFF ROBINSON, JASMINE C/O JULIA PERELMAN RECOVER FROM DEFENDANT WINTER, JOSHUA $1,438.74 PRINCIPAL, $22.00 COSTS, TOTAL JUDGMENT $1,460.74 STAY OF EXECUTION 30 DAYS | |
July 18, 2005 | Docket Event | AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE FILED IN COURT. | |
July 18, 2005 | Hearing | PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.