Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nemyah Nicole Wyatt, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Reeves, Dawna F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeReeves, Dawna F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Financial Statement and Notice to Defendant | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review Hearing
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.