Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Edgar Alberto Hernandez Cuevas, Hernandez, Edgar Alberto Cuevas, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Mangar, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangar, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Combined Drug Program Checklist | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.