Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez, Sonia Esther, Sonia Esther Hernandez, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt of Subpoenaed Records | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Financial Statement and Notice to Defendant | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.