Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carolina Garcia Miranda, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Stephens, Carrie M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Carrie M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 14, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Peremptory Challenge
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion & Motion | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Booking Fee Form | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.