Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Charles Ranando Stewart, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Mangar, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangar, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Advisement and Waiver | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Criminal Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.