Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Johnny M. Jones, Jones, Johnny M., represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Mangar, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangar, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.