Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Scott Allen Tackett, Tackett, Scott Allen, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.