Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Black, Robert Andrew, Robert Andrew Black, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Valli K. Israels presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValli K. Israels Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Related | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.