Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brock Conner Peterson, Peterson, Brock Conner, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | State Prison | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Investigation Report | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Law & Motion
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Marsden Motion Held | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.