Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bright, Troy James, Troy James Bright, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Calendar Request | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Pretrial Assessment Report | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.