Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Armando Rosales Rodriguez, Rodriguez, Armando Rosales, Jr, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cordova, Ricardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCordova, Ricardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant's Financial Statement and Notice to Defendant | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt of Subpoenaed Records | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt of Subpoenaed Records | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.