Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Krystal Elena Ramirez, Ramirez, Krystal Elena, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Carrie M. Stephens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarrie M. Stephens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Enrollment | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DUI with Priors | |
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.