Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rajneel Ravikesh Sen, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Robert B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Robert B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1368 Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Doubt Declared | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Combined Drug Program Checklist | |
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Cash Bail Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.