Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against John Carl Murphy, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bail Review Hearing
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Second-Strike Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.