Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Clifton Henry Hill, Hill, Clifton Henry, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Westbrook, Kellee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWestbrook, Kellee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Kellee |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Reassignment | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Recalled | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.