Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Fleming, Gary Ivan, Gary Ivan Fleming, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Mangar, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangar, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Combined Drug Program Checklist | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.