Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jayro Cervantes, represented by Gradford, Alonzo J, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Booking Fee Form | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.