Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Xxxxxx Xxxxx Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxxxxxx, Xxxxxx Xxxxx, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
February 04, 2022 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
January 28, 2022 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
January 07, 2022 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
December 10, 2021 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
November 08, 2021 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
November 01, 2021 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
October 04, 2021 | Drug Court Hearing | ||
September 27, 2021 | Mental Health | ||
September 13, 2021 | Mental Health |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.