Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Antonio Marcelino Ruiz, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.