Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mariah Rayleign Martinez, Martinez, Mariah Rayleign, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1368 Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1368 Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Health Doubt Declared-Additional | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned after Mental Health Doubt Declared | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Restored to Court's Control | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1368 Mental Competency Hearing
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.