Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carrillo, Nicole Elisabeth, Nicole Elisabeth Carrillo, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.