Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Christian Scott Sapien, Sapien, Christian Scott, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Beeson, Jared |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Investigation Report | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Sentenced |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.