Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Francisco J Ruiz, Ruiz, Francisco J, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.