Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Raymond Atish Bechan, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Mangar, Jeff presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMangar, Jeff Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Investigation Report | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Review Hearing Held | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Exonerated | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Surrender | |
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.