Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mendosa, Rigoberto, Rigoberto Mendosa, represented by Roth, Ryan A, Esq., Roth, Ryan A., Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Israels, Valli presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIsraels, Valli Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Israels, Valli |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Personal Appearance | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.