Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Benitez, Jessica Hernandez, represented by Villalobos, Aaron, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Zeff, Thomas D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZeff, Thomas D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Zeff, Thomas D |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Receipt of Subpoenaed Records | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Personal Appearance | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.