Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lorenzo Valdez, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Firearm Investigation Report | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: McFadden, Linda A |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Pretrial Assessment Report | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.