Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Payne, Travis Ray, Ii, Travis Ray Payne, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
July 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Attend Court Hearing | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.