Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brown, Chrysteen Nichole Smith, Chrysteen Nichole Smith Brown, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Gloria F. Rhynes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGloria F. Rhynes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Combined Drug Program Checklist | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.