Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Garcia, Ivan Salvador, Ivan Salvador Garcia, represented by Girdner, Mark W, Esq., Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Bail Bond Posted | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Bessey, Shawn |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.