Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hardeep Singh Gill, represented by Ennis, Scott B, Esq., in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Carrie M. Stephens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarrie M. Stephens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Interpreter Required During Hearing | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Search Order | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Rhynes, Gloria F. |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Booking Fee Form | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DUI with Priors |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.