Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Beck, Nicole Marie, Nicole Marie Beck, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 27, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2026 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Exoneration Letter | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.