Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Tyler Dean Platt, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Carrie M. Stephens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarrie M. Stephens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Reeves, Dawna F |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | First Appearance at Arraignment | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Own Recognizance | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.