Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Robert Ray Burgess, represented by Alternate Indigent Defense Lawyers, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Mangar, Jeff |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.