Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Longacre, Richard David, Richard David Longacre, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Bessey, Shawn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBessey, Shawn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
October 18, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
September 15, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
August 31, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
August 17, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
August 15, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
July 13, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
May 23, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
April 07, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing | ||
February 23, 2022 | PC1370 Commitment Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.