Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Shawn Michael Haney, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Leo, Nancy A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeo, Nancy A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2020 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sentencing
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Examination
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Leo, Nancy A |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Probation Order & Terms Form Print | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | In Custody | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Defendant Arraigned on Complaint | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Arraignment Held | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Arraignment Hearing
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Booking Fee Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.