Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jacob Dineen Moore, represented by Public Defender, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with McFadden, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcFadden, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Misd/Inf |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Stephens, Carrie M |
|
March 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pretrial
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order Related | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Cash Bail Posted | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Promise to Appear | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.