Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Frank Baptista Silva, Silva, Frank Baptista, represented by Girdner, Mark W, Esq., Peterson, Nathan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts Superior with Cordova, Ricardo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCordova, Ricardo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Westbrook, Robert B |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Mental Status Report | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PC1370 Commitment Hearing
Judge: Cordova, Ricardo |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Electronic Disposition Reporting | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Commitment Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.