Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gassuan, Guillaume, Moreno, Todd M, filed a(n) Writs Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen case represented by Ewbank, James B., Osborne, Michael Claude, Samra, Jaskiran K., Scott, Stephen Alter, against Benevolent And Protective Order Of Elks Of The, Does 1 To 1O Inclusive, Luhr, Michael T, Ostini, Robert, represented by Scott, Stephen Alter, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts with Garrett L. Wong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGarrett L. Wong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2018 |
CategoryWrits Of Mandate Or Proh., Certi., Etc./Admin. Agen |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY JAMES B. EWBANK INACTIVATED FOR FAILURE TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE. | |
November 27, 2019 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE CALENDAR FOR ATTORNEY JAMES B. EWBANK
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE SENT TO ATTORNEY JAMES B. EWBANK TO PAY PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE BY NOV-27-2019 | |
October 09, 2019 | Hearing |
PRO HAC VICE RENEWAL FEE STATUS FOR ATTORNEY JAMES B. EWBANK
Judge: GARRETT L. WONG |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PETITIONER GASSUAN, GUILLAUME MORENO, TODD M | |
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event | THE COURT ORDERED THE FOLLOWING JUDGMENT ENTERED: IT IS ADJUDGED THAT PETITIONER GASSUAN, GUILLAUME MORENO, TODD M RECOVER FROM RESPONDENT BENEVOLENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF ELKS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA LUHR, MICHAEL T OSTINI, ROBERT $16,613.70 COSTS AND ATTORNEY'S FEES, TOTAL JUDGMENT $16,613.70, (PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE) SEE SCANNED DOC | |
April 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS (TRANSACTION ID # 63203671) FILED BY ATTORNEY OSBORNE, MICHAEL CLAUDE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FILED (TRANSACTION ID # 63156377) BY APPELLANT BENEVOLENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF ELKS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA LUHR, MICHAEL T OSTINI, ROBERT | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | REFUND/REIMBURSEMENT OF $775.00 RE 35826 FOR TRANSACTION (), PAYABLE TO COURT OF APPEAL, DOC #1909737461, WARRANT #38205836, DATED APR-10-2019 | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF JASKIRAN K. SAMRA IN SUPPORT OF DEPOSIT OF REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FEE FOR NOTICE DESIGNATING RECORD ON APPEAL, TRAN # R0619403A003, TAG # 035862 (TRANSACTION ID # 63130943) FILED BY APPELLANT BENEVOLENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF ELKS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA LUHR, MICHAEL T OSTINI, ROBERT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.